Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1310 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023