House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/23 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Filed |