Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 847 (Ch. 2023-151) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/20/23, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Filed |