|
05/12/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-54
|
|
|
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/12/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/05/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/20/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|