House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/18/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|