Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1368 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2023