Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/21/23, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Filed |