LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S1380
Action History
FL
Florida Senate Bill S1380
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1380
Action History
Senate
05/05/2023
Died in Regulated Industries
Senate
03/16/2023
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/21/23, 2:30 pm, 401 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
Senate
03/14/2023
Introduced
Senate
03/09/2023
Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
Senate
03/01/2023
Filed