Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1382 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023