House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 965 (Ch. 2023-186) | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Transportation; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Filed |