Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1396 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 18, 2023