Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1398 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 24, 2023