Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1408 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023