Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157) | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/21/23, 2:30 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Filed |