Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1571 (Ch. 2023-302)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 1571
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/04/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|