Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Fiscal Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1517 (Ch. 2023-273) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Filed |