Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1446 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023