Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1127 (Ch. 2023-166), CS/HB 1125 (Ch. 2023-165)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 1127
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|