Senate | 05/02/2023 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1465 (Ch. 2023-87) | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Substituted CS/HB 1465 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/23 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/13/23, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Filed |