|
05/12/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-56
|
|
|
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|