Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/20/23, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Filed |