Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1480 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023