Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1373 (Ch. 2023-306), CS/CS/CS/HB 1595 (Ch. 2023-156) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Filed |