Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/18/23, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Filed |