Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed |