|
06/20/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-260, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1542 (Ch. 2023-261)
|
|
|
|
06/19/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (255691)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 119, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 255691 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/18/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/04/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|