Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1542 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 27, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2023