Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1564 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023