|
05/12/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-57
|
|
|
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 84, NAYS 34
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 512377 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 457173 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 129827 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 012605 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 056009 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 813935 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 178097 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 784701 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 640239 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 623627 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 28 NAYS 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Amendment(s) failed (513000, 634746, 837090)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|