Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1417 (Ch. 2023-314)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 1417
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/24/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|