LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S1626
Action History
FL
Florida Senate Bill S1626
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1626
Action History
Senate
05/05/2023
Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Senate
03/30/2023
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
Senate
03/14/2023
Introduced
Senate
03/09/2023
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
Senate
03/03/2023
Filed