Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1379 (Ch. 2023-169), CS/CS/HB 1279 (Ch. 2023-154)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1379
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/18/23, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/20/23, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|