Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 272 (Ch. 2023-248) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed |