Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Community Affairs; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed |