|
05/11/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-40
|
|
|
|
05/10/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 83, NAYS 36
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 083141 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 142275 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 770075 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 128091 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 528921 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 059615 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 784443 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 446659 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 851515 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 143159 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 239391 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 919979 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 132085 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 732081 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 139115 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 553093 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 827611 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 411147 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 27 NAYS 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Amendment(s) failed (361888, 383054, 613072)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 14 NAYS 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
CS by Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/15/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Rules; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|