Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S2510 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 29, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 22, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Prefiled

Bill March 23, 2023