05/25/2023 | Chapter No. 2023-119 | |||
05/24/2023 | Approved by Governor | |||
05/23/2023 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Ordered enrolled | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Passed; YEAS 108, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Substituted for HB 7001 | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/23/2023) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Immediately certified | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/15/23 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/08/23, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/21/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability |