06/16/2023 | Chapter No. 2023-244, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239) | |||
06/15/2023 | Approved by Governor | |||
06/14/2023 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Conference Committee Report adopted | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Amendment 106726 adopted | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Conference Committee Report considered | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Conference Committee Report adopted (106726) | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Conference Committee Report received | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | In Messages | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Conference Committee appointed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Conference Committee appointed: Conference Committee on Appropriations: Broxson (Chair), Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Conference Committee On Agriculture, Environment, And General Government/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Brodeur (Chair), Albritton, Berman, Boyd, DiCeglie, Garcia, Grall, Gruters, Mayfield, Osgood, Polsky, Rodriguez, Stewart, Trumbull, Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Conference Committee On Agriculture, Environment, And General Government/State Administration and Technology: Brodeur (Chair), Albritton, Berman, Boyd, DiCeglie, Garcia, Grall, Gruters, Mayfield, Osgood, Polsky, Rodriguez, Stewart, Trumbull, Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Conference Committee On Criminal And Civil Justice/Justice: Bradley (Chair), Baxley, Burgess, Hooper, Ingoglia, Martin, Pizzo, Powell, Rouson, Torres, Wright, Yarborough, Albritton (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large); Conference Committee On Education/Higher Education: Perry (Chair), Avila, Book, Broxson, Burton, Calatayud, Collins, Davis, Harrell, Hutson, Jones, Simon, Thompson, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Conference Committee On Education/PreK-12: Perry (Chair), Avila, Book, Broxson, Burton, Calatayud, Collins, Davis, Harrell, Hutson, Jones, Simon, Thompson, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Conference Committee On Health And Human Services/Health Care: Harrell (Chair), Avila, Baxley, Book, Bradley, Brodeur, Burgess, Burton, Calatayud, Davis, Garcia, Gruters, Martin, Osgood, Rouson, Simon, Albritton (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large); Conference Committee On Transportation, Tourism, And Economic Development/Infrastructure and Tourism: Hooper (Chair), Collins, DiCeglie, Grall, Perry, Polsky, Powell, Stewart, Thompson, Trumbull, Wright, Yarborough, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Rouson (At Large); | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Bill placed in Conference (Conference Committee on Appropriations) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | In returning messages | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Passed the Senate bill as amended by House and we accede to conference | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Amendment 256357 adopted | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Substituted for CS/HB 1219 | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Immediately certified | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | The Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/23 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/28/23, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Submitted for consideration by Criminal Justice |