Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7022 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Prefiled

Bill March 9, 2023