Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7028 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023

Prefiled

Bill March 16, 2023