Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Substituted HB 7063
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Finance and Tax; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/18/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Submitted for consideration by Finance and Tax
|
|
|