House
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/15/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|