Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0047 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 18, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 10, 2024