Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0073 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 17, 2024
Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis December 6, 2023
Analysis December 4, 2023