House | 03/08/2024 | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | CS Filed | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Favorable with CS by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | PCS added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Filed |