House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Now in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Favorable by Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Now in Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Filed |