House
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Favorable by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/22/2023
|
Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/18/2023
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/18/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/18/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee(Amended)
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2023
|
Favorable with amendment(s) by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|