Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0149 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 1, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 10, 2024
Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 26, 2024
Bill January 11, 2024