Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0151 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 12, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2024
Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2024