Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0159 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2024
Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill February 2, 2024